+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On January 2, 1974 in the House:
- Public law 93-241.
- Signed by President.
On December 22, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On December 20, 1973 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 20, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On December 19, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the District of Columbia, S. Rept. 93-651.
On November 27, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the District of Columbia.
On November 26, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #594 .
On November 20, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia with amendment, H. Rept. 93-657.
On November 1, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on District of Columbia.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor