+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 24, 1987 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-28.
- Signed by President.
On April 15, 1987 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On April 14, 1987 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On April 9, 1987 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
- House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
On April 8, 1987 in the House:
- Measure sent to the House.
On April 7, 1987 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 410 with an amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 410 amended.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On March 6, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 25.
On March 3, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On February 27, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 6.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-9.
On February 25, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry Discharged.
On February 20, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On February 18, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor