+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 23, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate, amended.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On May 9, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Finance, S. Rept. 95-790.
On March 1, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Finance.
On February 28, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On January 19, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means with amendment, H. Rept. 95-842.
On January 4, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor