+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 24, 1998 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 105-169.
- Signed by President.
On April 17, 1998 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 1, 1998 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On April 1, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 321.
On September 30, 1997 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On September 29, 1997 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Campbell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On April 2, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Operations and Human Rights.
On March 18, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor