+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On August 14, 1976 in the House:
- Private Law 94-91.
- Signed by President.
On August 10, 1976 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On August 5, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On August 5, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On August 4, 1976 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 94-1114.
On July 21, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On July 20, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On June 18, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary, H. Rept. 94-1280.
On December 9, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor