+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 1973 in the House:
- Public law 93-172.
- Signed by President.
On November 26, 1973 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On November 19, 1973 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On November 19, 1973 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On November 16, 1973 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 93-527.
On November 7, 1973 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
On November 6, 1973 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #561 .
On November 1, 1973 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 93-618.
On October 16, 1973 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor