+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1088 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On May 14, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 54.
- Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-110 .
On May 6, 2009 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor