+ − Summary
+ − Actions (35)
On August 3, 1990 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from Justice.
On February 9, 1990 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from DOT.
On May 12, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Legislation and National Security.
On May 1, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Oceanography.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce, Interior, EPA.
On March 20, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation and Hazardous Materials.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On March 17, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Mining and Natural Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Offshore Energy Resources.
On March 15, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Development, Finance, Trade, and Monetary Policy.
On March 6, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Operations.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation, Aviation and Materials.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy Research and Development.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT, GSA, OMB, DOE.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Buildings and Grounds.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Rights and International Organizations.
On March 3, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Development.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
On March 2, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Government Activities and Transportation.
On March 1, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On February 22, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Operations.
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor