+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 11, 2018 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-301.
- Signed by President.
On November 29, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7141)
On November 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8323)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1074.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8323-8324)
- Mr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On August 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 199.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-279.
On July 26, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House