+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 12, 2005 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-27.
- Signed by President.
On July 1, 2005 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On June 29, 2005 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On June 29, 2005 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On June 22, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On April 20, 2005 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1072 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Marchant moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On April 13, 2005 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor