+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On November 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 222.
On November 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
On November 2, 2011 in the House:
- Mr. Bachus moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1070 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 421 - 1 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
On September 14, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 112-206 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 135.
On June 22, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
On May 3, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises.
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Referral.
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor