+ − Summary
+ − Actions (18)
On March 17, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Youth and Families.
On March 13, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
- See H.R.1215 .
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity.
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
On March 3, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On March 2, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to House Banking and Financial Services
- Referred to the Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities, and in addition to the Committees on National Security, Banking and Financial Services, Ways and Means, Commerce, Government Reform and Oversight, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House National Security
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Economic and Educational Opportunities
- Referred to House Government Reform and Oversight
- Referred to House Commerce
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor