+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 18, 1975 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Public law 94-157.
On December 16, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On December 16, 1975 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On December 15, 1975 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On December 15, 1975 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to certain House amendments.
- Senate agreed to conference report.
On December 15, 1975 in the House:
- House receded and concurred to certain Senate amendments with an amendment.
- House receded and concurred in certain Senate amendments.
- House agreed to conference report, roll call #783 .
- Motion to recommit conference report to the Committee of Conference rejected in House, roll call #782 .
On December 12, 1975 in the House:
- Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 94-718.
On December 11, 1975 in the House:
- Conference scheduled in House.
On December 10, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Conference scheduled in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #572 .
On December 9, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
On December 8, 1975 in the Senate:
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Call of calendar in Senate.
On December 5, 1975 in the Senate:
- Cloture motion filed in Senate on motion to proceed to consideration .
- Cloture motion filed in Senate on motion to proceed to consideration.
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Appropriations with amendments, S. Rept. 94-511.
On November 14, 1975 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations.
On November 13, 1975 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #699 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by unanimous consent in House.
On November 7, 1975 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Appropriations, H. Rept. 94-645.
- Referred to House Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor