+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On April 2, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 31, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 24, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 20, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic and Commercial Law.
On March 7, 1991 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from ICC.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Surface Transportation.
On February 21, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Public Works + Transportation.
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor