+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 289.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-390.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor