+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 9, 1992 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 368.
- Reported by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 102-662.
On May 19, 1992 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from Labor.
On September 24, 1991 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On July 23, 1991 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 8, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On May 1, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 30, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 24, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 17, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 4, 1991 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Labor.
On March 21, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health and Safety.
On February 21, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor