+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On October 18, 1978 in the House:
- Private Law 95-61.
- Signed by President.
On October 10, 1978 in the House:
- Measure presented to President.
On October 4, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On October 4, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
On October 3, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House.
On September 22, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, H. Rept. 95-1617.
On January 26, 1978 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor