+ − Summary
+ − Actions (15)
On July 12, 1976 in the Senate:
- Public law 94-358.
- Signed by President.
On July 6, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On July 6, 1976 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On July 1, 1976 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On July 1, 1976 in the Senate:
- Measure passed Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Committee on Finance discharged in Senate.
On May 4, 1976 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Finance.
On May 3, 1976 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended.
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up by consent calendar in House.
On April 5, 1976 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Post Office and Civil Service with amendment, H. Rept. 94-1008.
On November 5, 1975 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor