+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 3, 2022 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 117-162.
- Signed by President.
On August 2, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On July 28, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On July 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3736)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S3736)
On July 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7153-7154)
On July 26, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7153-7154)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1057.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7153-7155)
- Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E134)
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (299)
Type:
Primary Sponsor