+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On December 3, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6092-6094)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1049.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6092-6096)
- Mr. Case moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 494.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-601.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (222)
Type:
Primary Sponsor