+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 1, 1999 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 106-32.
- Signed by President.
On May 27, 1999 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 26, 1999 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On May 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On May 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 118.
- Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain without amendment. Without written report.
On May 5, 1999 in the Senate:
- Committee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On April 28, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On April 27, 1999 in the House:
- Mr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-107 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 60.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1034 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 22, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Discharged.
On March 10, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
On March 9, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor