+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 9, 1986 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands and Reserved Water.
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On October 6, 1986 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On October 6, 1986 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On October 1, 1986 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on National Parks and Recreation Discharged.
On September 11, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 1, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
On February 12, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Recreation.
On January 3, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor