+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On April 26, 1984 in the House:
- Clean Bill H.R.5525 Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee in Lieu.
On April 11, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On December 1, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 3, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 8, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce, Justice.
On February 4, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Courts, Civil Liberties, and the Administration of Justice.
On January 27, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor