+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On October 14, 1981 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Agency Administration.
On October 6, 1981 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, and referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On October 5, 1981 in the House:
- Passed House by Unanimous Consent.
- Called up by House on Call of Consent Calendar.
On September 22, 1981 in the House:
- Placed on Consent Calendar No: 12.
- Placed on House Calendar No: 54.
- Reported to House by House Committee on The Judiciary. Report No: 97-236.
On September 15, 1981 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 19, 1981 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 17, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
On January 22, 1981 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor