+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 219.
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-274.
On September 18, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 15.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor