+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
- Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry without amendment. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 387.
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Ms. Ros-Lehtinen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1016 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor