+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On June 10, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 8, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On April 1, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 17, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Arms Control, International Security and Science.
On February 4, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Legislation.
- Referred to House Committee on Intelligence .
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor