+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 10, 1978 in the Senate:
- Public Law 95-437.
- Signed by President.
On September 29, 1978 in the Senate:
- Measure presented to President.
- Measure enrolled in Senate.
On September 29, 1978 in the House:
- Measure enrolled in House.
On September 26, 1978 in the House:
- Cleared for White House
On September 26, 1978 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to House amendments.
On September 22, 1978 in the Senate:
- House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment.
On August 25, 1978 in the Senate:
- Call of calendar in Senate.
- Measure considered in Senate.
- Measure passed Senate, amended, in lieu of S. 518 .
On August 24, 1978 in the Senate:
- Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs, .
On March 15, 1978 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
On March 13, 1978 in the House:
- Measure passed House, amended, roll call #133 .
- Measure considered in House.
- Measure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
On March 8, 1978 in the House:
- Reported to House from the Committee on Post Office and Civil Service with amendment, H. Rept. 95-932.
On November 29, 1977 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor