+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 2, 1988 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
On May 28, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On May 27, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
On May 8, 1987 in the House:
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 62.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-87.
On April 1, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 24, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 3, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 11, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On February 4, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor