+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (53)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802)
- Enacted, Chapter 802 (effective 7/1/17)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2386ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2386ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 17105880D-H2
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stuart, Ebbin, Obenshain
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Delegates: Loupassi, Bell, Robert B., Carr
- Conferees appointed by House
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2386H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104867D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17104867D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 17103954D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (12)
April 5, 2017: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 5, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 24, 2017: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2017: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2017: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
February 15, 2017: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor