+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0609)
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 609 (effective 7/1/03)
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2003 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2484ER)
On February 17, 2003 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 033470948-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute 033470948-S1
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2003 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 033470948-S1
On February 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2003 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2003 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute 030346948-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 030346948-H1
- Read second time
On January 27, 2003 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2003 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 030346948-H1
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/03 030251948
+ − Votes (8)
February 17, 2003: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2003: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2003: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2003: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2003: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2003: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor