+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pub. Ch. 1063
- Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 64, Nays 19 PNV 0
On April 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee report adopted, ayes 28 nays 2
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate refused to concur in amendments #1 & #3
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/21/2016
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate refused to recede from its non-concurrence.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- H. refused to recede from am. no. SA3 SB2481
- H. refused to recede from am. no. SA1 SB2481
- Conf. comm. appointed ( Holt, Lynn, Turner)
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/22/2016
- Conference Committee appointed. (Johnson, Green, Massey)
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 4/20/2016
- Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA1053)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0716)
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1049)
- Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 3
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Subst. for comp. HB.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0904)
- Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1232)
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1233)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 70, Nays 19, PNV 1
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/21/2016
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2016
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/19/2016
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/18/2016
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2016
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2016
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2016
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2016
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2016
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2016
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/4/2016
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2016
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (7)
April 22, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: Make Action of the Senate MOTION TO ADOPT Conference Committee Report
- Yeas: 8
April 22, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED
- Yeas: 8
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 3 BY Green
- Yeas: 8
April 20, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2016: SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 8, 2016: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor