+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date Sec. 1-23, 25-26 08/01/14; Sec. 24
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Governor's action Approval
- Secretary of State Chapter 287
On May 16, 2014 in the House:
- Presentment date
- Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed (vote: 55-6)
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- House adopted HCC report and repassed bill
- Third reading (vote: 55-6)
- Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill
- Conference committee report, delete everything
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to return bill to conference committee
- Conference committee report, delete everything
- Motion to adopt conference committee report
- House adopted conference committee report (vote: 83-46)
- Motion did not prevail (vote: 54-76)
- Motion to adopt conference committee report question recurred
- Third reading as amended by Conference
- Bill was repassed as amended by Conference (vote: 111-19)
On May 9, 2014 in the House:
- Senate conferees Reinert, Dibble, Gazelka
- Senate accedes, conference committee of 3 be appointed
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with amendment
- House refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- House not concur, conference committee of 3 requested
- House conferees Sawatzky; Sundin; Hornstein
- Senate accedes, CC of 3 be appointed
- Senate conferees Reinert; Dibble; Gazelka
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- House conferees Sawatzky, Sundin, Hornstein
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Order: Amended
- Third reading Passed (vote: 53-10)
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Comm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF2154
- Second reading
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2154, now on General Orders
- Introduction and first reading
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House
- Third reading as amended
- Amended
- Bill was passed as amended (vote: 108-18)
On April 25, 2014 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, April 29, 2014
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Government Operations
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Policy
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor