+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Reading waived
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Agree To (77-Y 19-N)
- Agreed to by House (77-Y 19-N)
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ542H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21104000D-H1
- Taken up
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 21104000D-H1
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Rules (17-Y 1-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Rules sub: Studies
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102752D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2021: VOTE: Agree To (77-Y 19-N)
January 29, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2021: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2021: Reported from Rules (17-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor