+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 567 (effective 7/1/22)
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB705ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (69-Y 31-N)
- Passed House (69-Y 31-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N)
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Read first time
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 Highway Safety and Policy
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB705S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22105882D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22105882D-S1
- Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 22103299D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 1, 2022: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 31-N)
February 24, 2022: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N)
February 23, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2022: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2022: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 9, 2022: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2022: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor