+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1650 is now Act 565
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Received from the House.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor