+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB228 is now Act 204
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Hickey
+ − Votes (2)
February 19, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 3
February 7, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35