+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB82 is now Act 92
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- CLINCHER MOTION ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on House Committee on City, County and Local Affairs
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on City, County and Local Affairs
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Jeffress
+ − Votes (2)
February 17, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
February 9, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor