+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB817 is now Act 1520
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, FORESTRY & ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Revenue and Taxation
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 9
April 6, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor