+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1505 is now Act 565
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Beck
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 14, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor