+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB527 is now Act 1236
On April 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Amendment # 3 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 2
- Rules suspended.
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Education
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Education
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Dismang
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. Dismang
Amendment S3
Sponsored by J. Dismang
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 12
March 29, 2011: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor