+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB2028 is now Act 1495
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 1
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Insurance and Commerce
- Received from the House.
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Vines
Amendment S1
Sponsored by B. Sample
+ − Votes (3)
April 19, 2013: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 83
- Present/NV: 17
April 18, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1
April 4, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor