+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 435
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Military and Veterans Affairs Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 366
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 403 Amendment HCR6017A
- House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 17. H.J. 400
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 386
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2020: Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed
March 3, 2020: Military and Veterans Affairs Adopt Resolution, Passed
February 26, 2020: House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor