+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- Notification that HB1548 is now Act 571
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by K. Hammer
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Penzo
+ − Votes (3)
March 30, 2021: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
March 29, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6