+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB2067 is now Act 735
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Received from the House.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Irvin
+ − Votes (3)
March 22, 2017: Senate amendment # 1 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 14
March 21, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 2
March 13, 2017: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 80
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 17
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor