+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB1019 is now Act 1265
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 6, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 and 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Bookout
Amendment S2
Sponsored by J. Dismang
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 24
April 5, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor