+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1967 is now Act 1067
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
April 10, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 5
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor