+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB625 is now Act 1047
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended.
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Re-referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Withdrawn from Committee for purpose of amendment # 1
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare, and Labor
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment S1
Sponsored by E. Cheatham
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2015: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 83
- Present/NV: 17
March 19, 2015: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor