+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1929 is now Act 954
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned from the Senate as passed, with the Emergency Clause having failed.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Public Health, Welfare and Labor
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Davis
+ − Votes (3)
March 28, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
March 28, 2013: Emergency Clause failed of adoption.
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
March 21, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 15
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor