+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB342 is now Act 805
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1, 2 and 3 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1, 2 and 3
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1 & 2 & 3
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 3 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 3
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Rules suspended.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS-SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment H3
Sponsored by Lundstrum
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Lundstrum
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Lundstrum
Amendment S1
Sponsored by J. Cooper
+ − Votes (3)
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
April 1, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 23
February 26, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor